US HJR80 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Became Public Law No: 111-156.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Became Public Law No: 111-156.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses appreciation for the efforts of the Blinded Veterans Association in improving rehabilitation services, education, and benefits for blinded veterans. Supports the goals and ideals of Blinded Veterans Day, and calls upon the people of the United States to observe such Day.
Title
Recognizing and honoring the Blinded Veterans Association on its 65th anniversary of representing blinded veterans and their families.
Sponsors
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] | Rep. Steve Buyer [R-IN] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] |
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Bob Filner [D-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Deborah Halvorson [D-IL] | Rep. Maurice Hinchey [D-NY] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] |
Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] | Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] | Rep. Dennis Moore [D-KS] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Became Public Law No: 111-156. | |
2010-04-07 | Signed by President. | |
2010-04-01 | Presented to President. | |
2010-03-26 | Cleared for White House. | |
2010-03-26 | Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2166) | |
2010-03-24 | Received in the Senate, read twice. | |
2010-03-23 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 416 - 0 (Roll no. 174). (text: CR 3/22/2010 H2182) | |
2010-03-23 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2228-2229) | |
2010-03-22 | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Filner objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. | |
2010-03-22 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.J. Res. 80. | |
2010-03-22 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2182-2184) | |
2010-03-22 | Mr. Filner moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution. | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Disability and paralysis
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Disability and paralysis
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' organizations and recognition