US HJR69 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Became Public Law No: 115-20. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Became Public Law No: 115-20. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the final rule of the Department of the Interior relating to "Non-Subsistence Take of Wildlife, and Public Participation and Closure Procedures, on National Wildlife Refuges in Alaska". This joint resolution nullifies the rule finalized by the Department of the Interior on August 5, 2016, relating to non-subsistence takings of wildlife and public participation and closure procedures on National Wildlife Refuges in Alaska.
Title
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the final rule of the Department of the Interior relating to "Non-Subsistence Take of Wildlife, and Public Participation and Closure Procedures, on National Wildlife Refuges in Alaska".
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate without amendment RC# 92 (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - On passage RC# 98 (Y: 225 N: 193 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - On passage RC# 98 (Y: 225 N: 193 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-20. (TXT | PDF) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 47. Record Vote Number: 92. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S1864-1884) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1864) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2017-02-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-02-16 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 225 - 193 (Roll no. 98). (text: CR H1260) |
2017-02-16 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1278-1279) |
2017-02-16 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.J. Res. 69, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Beyer demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage until a time to be announced. |
2017-02-16 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2017-02-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 69. |
2017-02-16 | House | The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on both H.J.Res. 43 and H.J.Res. 69; and provides for proceedings during the period from February 17, 2017, through February 24, 2017. |
2017-02-16 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 123. (consideration: CR H1259-1268) |
2017-02-15 | House | Rule H. Res. 123 passed House. |
2017-02-14 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 123 Reported to House. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on both H.J.Res. 43 and H.J.Res. 69; and provides for proceedings during the period from February 17, 2017, through February 24, 2017. |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR35 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HJR49 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HR123 (Related) 2017-02-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SJR18 (Related) 2017-02-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HJR49 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HR123 (Related) 2017-02-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SJR18 (Related) 2017-02-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Alaska
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Hunting and fishing
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Alaska
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Hunting and fishing
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection