US HJR32 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing a balanced budget amendment to the Constitution of the United States.
Title
Proposing a balanced budget amendment to the Constitution of the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Obernolte [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-03-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR2 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR3 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR8 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR13 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SJR6 (Related) 2021-02-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HJR78 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR3 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR8 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR13 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SJR6 (Related) 2021-02-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HJR78 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-joint-resolution/32/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hjres32/BILLS-117hjres32ih.pdf |