US HJR29 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 71.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 71.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the United States Fish and Wildlife Service relating to "Endangered and Threatened Wildlife and Plants; Lesser Prairie-Chicken; Threatened Status With Section 4(d) Rule for the Northern Distinct Population Segment and Endangered Status for the Southern Distinct Population Segment".
Title
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the United States Fish and Wildlife Service relating to "Endangered and Threatened Wildlife and Plants; Lesser Prairie-Chicken; Threatened Status With Section 4(d) Rule for the Northern Distinct Population Segment and Endangered Status for the Southern Distinct Population Segment".
Sponsors
Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] | Rep. Stephanie Bice [R-OK] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Ronny Jackson [R-TX] |
Rep. Jacob Laturner [R-KS] | Rep. Josh Brecheen [R-OK] | Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS] | Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] |
Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 71. |
2023-06-05 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-94. |
2023-04-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 12. |
2023-04-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-04-28 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries Discharged. |
2023-04-18 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries. |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SJR9 (Same As) 2023-09-28 - Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 47 - 46. Record Vote Number: 242.