US HJR2 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 65-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 233 - 184 (Roll no. 138). (text: CR H3162)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 233 - 184 (Roll no. 138). (text: CR H3162)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing a balanced budget amendment to the Constitution of the United States. This joint resolution proposes a constitutional amendment prohibiting total outlays for a fiscal year from exceeding total receipts for that fiscal year unless Congress authorizes the excess by a three-fifths roll call vote of each chamber. The prohibition excludes outlays for repayment of debt principal and receipts derived from borrowing. The amendment requires a three-fifths roll call vote of each chamber of Congress to increase the public debt limit. It requires a majority roll vote of each chamber to increase revenue. It also requires the President to submit a balanced budget to Congress annually. Congress is authorized to waive these requirements when a declaration of war is in effect or if the United States is engaged in a military conflict which causes an imminent and serious military threat to national security.
Title
Proposing a balanced budget amendment to the Constitution of the United States.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution RC# 138 (Y: 233 N: 184 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 233 - 184 (Roll no. 138). (text: CR H3162) |
2018-04-12 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3193) |
2018-04-12 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-04-12 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 811, the House proceeded with 4 hours of debate on H.J. Res. 2. |
2018-04-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3162-3192) |
2018-04-12 | House | Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution. |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR1 (Related) 2017-01-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR8 (Related) 2017-01-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR14 (Related) 2017-01-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR18 (Related) 2017-01-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR98 (Related) 2017-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR109 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR8 (Related) 2017-01-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR14 (Related) 2017-01-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR18 (Related) 2017-01-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR98 (Related) 2017-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR109 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Subjects
Budget deficits and national debt
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Economics and public finance
Income tax rates
Legislative rules and procedure
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Economics and public finance
Income tax rates
Legislative rules and procedure