US HJR19 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional Amendment - Grants Congress the power to prohibit the physical desecration of the U.S. flag.
Title
Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States giving Congress power to prohibit the physical desecration of the flag of the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Jo Emerson [R-MO] | Rep. Ander Crenshaw [R-FL] | Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] | Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] |
Rep. C.W. Young [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice. |
2013-01-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR47 (Same As) 2013-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
SJR17 (Same As) 2013-06-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SJR17 (Same As) 2013-06-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Constitution and constitutional amendments
First Amendment rights
Government operations and politics
National symbols
First Amendment rights
Government operations and politics
National symbols
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-joint-resolution/19/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hjres19/BILLS-113hjres19ih.pdf |