US HCR99 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Pending: House Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Pending: House Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution supports the designation of Honoring the Nation's First Responders Day.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of October 28, 2020, as "Honoring the Nation's First Responders Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2020-05-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HCR37 (Related) 2020-09-04 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 92.
SCR15 (Related) 2019-06-10 - Held at the desk.
SCR48 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text: CR S5987)
SCR15 (Related) 2019-06-10 - Held at the desk.
SCR48 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text: CR S5987)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Emergency management
First responders and emergency personnel
Congressional tributes
Emergency management
First responders and emergency personnel
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-concurrent-resolution/99/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hconres99/BILLS-116hconres99ih.pdf |