US HCR37 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-04 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 92.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-04 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 92.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This concurrent resolution supports the designation of Honoring the Nation's First Responders Day.
Title
Expressing support for designation of October 28 as "Honoring the Nation's First Responders Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] |
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] |
Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] |
Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] |
Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] |
Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] |
Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-04 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 92. |
2020-09-04 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-488. |
2019-10-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-10-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-29 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-05-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SCR15 (Related) 2019-06-10 - Held at the desk.
HCR99 (Related) 2020-05-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
SCR48 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text: CR S5987)
HCR99 (Related) 2020-05-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
SCR48 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text: CR S5987)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Emergency management
First responders and emergency personnel
Congressional tributes
Emergency management
First responders and emergency personnel