US HCR93 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for a joint session of Congress to receive a message from the President.
Title
Providing for a joint session of Congress to receive a message from the President.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2246) |
2024-03-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-03-05 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. |
2024-03-05 | House | Considered as privileged matter. |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HCR11 (Related) 2023-02-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.