US HCR82 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-22 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-22 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the printing of a revised and updated version of the House document entitled "Black Americans in Congress, 1870-1989".
Title
Authorizing the printing of a revised and updated version of the House document entitled "Black Americans in Congress, 1870-1989".
Sponsors
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-21 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9755) |
2022-12-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-09-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
2022-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-09-21 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H8032) |
2022-09-21 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H8032) |
2022-09-21 | House | Ms. Lofgren asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2022-09-21 | House | Committee on House Administration discharged. |
2022-03-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2022-03-31 | House | Introduced in House |