US HCR74 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the National Peace Officers Memorial Service and the National Honor Guard and Pipe Band Exhibition.
Title
Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the National Peace Officers Memorial Service and the National Honor Guard and Pipe Band Exhibition.
Sponsors
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2170) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2022-03-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-03-29 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H3901) |
2022-03-29 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H3901) |
2022-03-29 | House | Mr. DeFazio asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2022-03-29 | House | Committee on Transportation discharged. |
2022-03-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2022-03-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-03-02 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2022-02-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2022-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HCR41 (Related) 2021-09-24 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.