US HCR64 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-12 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-12 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses the deepest appreciation to the families of members of the Armed Forces who serve or have served in defense of the United States. Recognizes the contributions that military families make, and encourages the people of the United States to share in appreciation for the sacrifices of military families. Urges the President to designate a "Year of the Military Family" and encourage the people of the United States and the Department of Defense (DOD) to observe it.
Title
Urging the President to designate 2009 as the "Year of the Military Family".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-12 | Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. | |
2009-03-11 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-03-11 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 0 (Roll no. 119). (text: CR H3297) | |
2009-03-11 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3315-3316) | |
2009-03-11 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2009-03-11 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 64. | |
2009-03-11 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3297-3300) | |
2009-03-11 | Mr. Skelton moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SR165 (Related) 2009-06-02 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5982-5983; text as passed Senate: CR S5982-5983; text of measure as introduced: CR S5951)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Military personnel and dependents
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Military personnel and dependents