US HCR57 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-0)
Status: Introduced on November 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on International Development, International Organizations and Global Corporate Social Impact.
Pending: House Subcommittee on International Development, International Organizations and Global Corporate Social Impact Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on International Development, International Organizations and Global Corporate Social Impact.
Pending: House Subcommittee on International Development, International Organizations and Global Corporate Social Impact Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Celebrating the first anniversary of the coalition of signatory countries to the Geneva Consensus Declaration on Promoting Women's Health and Strengthening the Family.
Title
Celebrating the first anniversary of the coalition of signatory countries to the Geneva Consensus Declaration on Promoting Women's Health and Strengthening the Family.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on International Development, International Organizations and Global Corporate Social Impact. |
2021-11-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2021-11-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SCR17 (Same As) 2021-10-28 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S7465-7466)
SCR49 (Related) 2022-11-17 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S6786-6787)
SCR49 (Related) 2022-11-17 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S6786-6787)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-concurrent-resolution/57/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hconres57/BILLS-117hconres57ih.pdf |