US HCR35 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the National Peace Officers Memorial Service and the National Honor Guard and Pipe Band Exhibition. (Sec. 1) Permits the Grand Lodge of the Fraternal Order of Police and its auxiliary to sponsor as free public events on the Capitol grounds: the 36th Annual National Peace Officers' Memorial Service, on May 15, 2017, to honor the law enforcement officers who died in the line of duty during 2016; and the National Honor Guard and Pipe Band Exhibition, on May 14, 2017, to allow law enforcement representatives to exhibit their ability to demonstrate Honor Guard programs and provide for a bag pipe exhibition.
Title
Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the National Peace Officers Memorial Service and the National Honor Guard and Pipe Band Exhibition.
Sponsors
Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2630) |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2017-04-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-04-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2820) |
2017-04-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 35. |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2820-2821) |
2017-04-25 | House | Mr. Ferguson moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 38. |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-87. |
2017-03-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-03-29 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2017-03-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HCR115 (Related) 2018-04-23 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congress
Law enforcement officers
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
U.S. Capitol
Congress
Law enforcement officers
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
U.S. Capitol