US HCR115 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the National Peace Officers Memorial Service and the National Honor Guard and Pipe Band Exhibition. (Sec. 1) Permits the Grand Lodge of the Fraternal Order of Police and its auxiliary to sponsor as free public events on the Capitol grounds: the 37th Annual National Peace Officers' Memorial Service, on May 15, 2018, to honor the law enforcement officers who died in the line of duty during 2017; and the National Honor Guard and Pipe Band Exhibition, on May 14, 2018, to allow law enforcement representatives to exhibit their ability to demonstrate Honor Guard programs and provide for a bag pipe exhibition.
Title
Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the National Peace Officers Memorial Service and the National Honor Guard and Pipe Band Exhibition.
Sponsors
Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2330) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2018-04-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-04-17 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H3381) |
2018-04-17 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H3381) |
2018-04-17 | House | Committee on Transportation discharged. |
2018-04-17 | House | Mr. Barletta asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2018-04-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-04-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-03-16 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2018-03-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2018-03-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HCR115 (Related) 2018-04-23 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HCR35 (Related) 2017-04-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HCR35 (Related) 2017-04-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.