US HCR292 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-14 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-14 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Supports the goals and ideals of National Aerospace Week. Recognizes the contributions of the aerospace industry to the history, economy, security, and educational system of the United States.
Title
Supporting the goals and ideals of National Aerospace Week, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Norman Dicks [D-WA] |
Rep. Vernon Ehlers [R-MI] | Rep. Gabrielle Giffords [D-AZ] | Rep. Jane Harman [D-CA] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. Laura Richardson [D-CA] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Betty Sutton [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-14 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-09-13 | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. | |
2010-09-13 | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7048) | |
2010-07-22 | Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. | |
2010-07-21 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-07-21 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 0 (Roll no. 454). (text: CR H5878) | |
2010-07-21 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5882-5883) | |
2010-07-21 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2010-07-21 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 292. | |
2010-07-21 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5878-5880) | |
2010-07-21 | Mr. Gordon (TN) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2010-06-30 | Referred to the House Committee on Science and Technology. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR167 (Related) 2009-09-10 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SR242 (Related) 2009-09-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S9487)
SR242 (Related) 2009-09-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S9487)
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Space flight and exploration
Transportation and public works
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Space flight and exploration
Transportation and public works