US HCR25 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the National Peace Officers Memorial Service and the National Honor Guard and Pipe Band Exhibition. Permits the Grand Lodge of the Fraternal Order of Police and its auxiliary to sponsor a free public event on the Capitol grounds, namely: the National Honor Guard and Pipe Band Exhibition on May 14, 2015, to allow law enforcement representatives to exhibit their ability to demonstrate Honor Guard programs and provide for a bag pipe exhibition; and the 34th Annual National Peace Officers' Memorial Service on May 15, 2015, to honor the law enforcement officers who died in the line of duty during 2014.
Title
Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the National Peace Officers Memorial Service and the National Honor Guard and Pipe Band Exhibition.
Sponsors
Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Agree (Y: 410 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2417) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2015-04-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-04-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 0 (Roll no. 162). (text: CR H2333-2334) |
2015-04-21 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2344-2345) |
2015-04-21 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2015-04-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 25. |
2015-04-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2333-2335) |
2015-04-21 | House | Mr. Barletta moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. |
2015-04-20 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 23. |
2015-04-20 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-87. |
2015-04-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-04-15 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2015-03-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2015-03-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HCR117 (Related) 2016-04-14 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congress
Law enforcement officers
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
U.S. Capitol
Congress
Law enforcement officers
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
U.S. Capitol