US HCR117 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the National Peace Officers Memorial Service and the National Honor Guard and Pipe Band Exhibition. Permits the Grand Lodge of the Fraternal Order of Police and its auxiliary to sponsor a free public event on the Capitol grounds, namely: the National Honor Guard and Pipe Band Exhibition on May 14, 2016, to allow law enforcement representatives to exhibit their ability to demonstrate Honor Guard programs and provide for a bag pipe exhibition; and the 35th Annual National Peace Officers' Memorial Service, on May 15, 2016, to honor the law enforcement officers who died in the line of duty during 2015.
Title
Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the National Peace Officers Memorial Service and the National Honor Guard and Pipe Band Exhibition.
Sponsors
Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2064-2065) |
2016-04-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-04-12 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H1619) |
2016-04-12 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H1619) |
2016-04-12 | House | Mr. Barletta asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 103. |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-469. |
2016-03-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2016-03-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-03-02 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2016-02-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2016-02-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HCR25 (Related) 2015-04-27 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congress
Law enforcement officers
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
U.S. Capitol
Congress
Law enforcement officers
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
U.S. Capitol