US HCR249 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commemorates the 45th anniversary of Bloody Sunday, and observes and celebrates the 45th anniversary of the enactment of the Voting Rights Act of 1965. Pledges the House of Representatives to advance the legacy of the Voting Rights Act of 1965 to ensure its continued effectiveness in protecting the voting rights of all people in the United States. Encourages all people in the United States to reflect upon the sacrifices of the Bloody Sunday marchers and acknowledge that their sacrifice made possible the passage of the Voting Rights Act of 1965.
Title
Commemorating the 45th anniversary of Bloody Sunday and the role that it played in ensuring the passage of the Voting Rights Act of 1965.
Sponsors
Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-03-16 | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1631) | |
2010-03-11 | Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. | |
2010-03-10 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-03-10 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 409 - 0 (Roll no. 99). (text: CR H1228) | |
2010-03-10 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1286) | |
2010-03-10 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2010-03-10 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 249. | |
2010-03-10 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1228-1232) | |
2010-03-10 | Mr. Cohen moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Subjects
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
Voting rights
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
Voting rights