US HCR227 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) National Urban Crimes Awareness Week provides a special opportunity to educate Americans about urban violence; and (2) it is appropriate to acknowledge victims of urban violence and to commend efforts to prevent such violence. Calls for recognition of: (1) national and community organizations and private sector supporters for their work in promoting awareness about urban violent crimes and in assisting victims, families, and survivors of such crimes; (2) public safety, law enforcement, and health professionals for their efforts to combat urban violent crime; and (3) victim advocates and criminal justice professionals for their work in establishing alternatives to incarceration and rehabilitation programs for offenders and victims alike. Recommends that national and community organizations, private businesses, colleges and universities, and the media: (1) promote awareness of violent urban crimes and strategies to decrease the incidence of these crimes; and (2) support the goals and ideals of National Urban Crimes Awareness Week.
Title
Supporting the goals and ideals of National Urban Crimes Awareness Week.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Cardoza [D-CA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] |
Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] |
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Pedro Pierluisi [N-PR] |
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Edolphus Towns [D-NY] | Rep. Melvin Watt [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. | |
2010-02-25 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-02-25 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 0 (Roll no. 68). (text: CR 2/23/2010 H687) | |
2010-02-25 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H907) | |
2010-02-23 | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Scott (VA) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. | |
2010-02-23 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 227. | |
2010-02-23 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H687-688) | |
2010-02-23 | Mr. Scott (VA) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. | |
2010-01-13 | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Health personnel
Law enforcement officers
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Violent crime
Congressional tributes
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Health personnel
Law enforcement officers
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Violent crime