US HCR209 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-11-09 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-11-09 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes the 30th anniversary of the Iranian hostage crisis during which 52 U.S. citizens were held hostage for 444 days. Honors the service of the U.S. diplomats and military personnel held hostage and the servicemen who were killed or wounded in an attempt to free the hostages. Supports all Iranian citizens who embrace the values of freedom, human rights, civil liberties, and rule of law. Urges the Secretary of State to make every effort to assist U.S. citizens held hostage in Iran at any time during the period beginning November 4, 1979, through January 20, 1981, and their survivors in matters of detention-related compensation.
Title
Recognizing the 30th anniversary of the Iranian hostage crisis, during which 52 United States citizens were held hostage for 444 days from November 4, 1979, to January 20, 1981, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-09 | Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. | |
2009-11-07 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-11-07 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 11/6/2009 H12546-12547) | |
2009-11-07 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H12969) | |
2009-11-06 | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. McMahon objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. | |
2009-11-06 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 209. | |
2009-11-06 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H12546-12549) | |
2009-11-06 | Mr. McMahon moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2009-11-05 | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Human rights
International affairs
Iran
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Rule of law and government transparency
Congressional tributes
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Human rights
International affairs
Iran
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Rule of law and government transparency