US HCR206 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-23 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-23 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes: (1) Fort Gordon as the home of the United States Army Signal Corps on the occasion of the 60th anniversary of Fort Gordon serving as the home of the Signal Corps Training Center; and (2) the contributions of Fort Gordon to Operation Iraqi Freedom and Operation Enduring Freedom. Commends the soldiers, their families, and the civilian personnel at Fort Gordon for their service and dedication to the United States.
Title
Commending the soldiers and civilian personnel stationed at Fort Gordon and their families for their service and dedication to the United States and recognizing the contributions of Fort Gordon to Operation Iraqi Freedom and Operation Enduring Freedom and its role as a pivotal communications training installation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-23 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2009-12-22 | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. | |
2009-12-22 | Senate Committee on Armed Services discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S13792) | |
2009-12-09 | Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. | |
2009-12-08 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-12-08 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 404 - 0 (Roll no. 933). (text: CR 12/7/2009 H13526) | |
2009-12-08 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H13571-13572) | |
2009-12-07 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2009-12-07 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 206. | |
2009-12-07 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H13526-13527) | |
2009-12-07 | Ms. Bordallo moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. | |
2009-11-05 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. | |
2009-10-28 | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
Subjects
Afghanistan
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Georgia
Iraq
Middle East
Military facilities and property
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Georgia
Iraq
Middle East
Military facilities and property
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents