US HCR146 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Declares that when the House adjourns on the legislative day of Friday, December 21, 2012, it stand adjourned until 2 p.m. on Thursday, December 27, 2012. Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on the legislative day of Friday, December 21, 2012, or Saturday, December 22, 2012, it stand recessed or adjourned until noon on Thursday, December 27, 2012.
Title
Providing for a conditional adjournment of the House of Representatives and a conditional recess or adjournment of the Senate.
Sponsors
Rep. John Boehner [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-12-21 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H7427) |
2012-12-21 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H7427) |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-concurrent-resolution/146/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hconres146/BILLS-112hconres146eh.pdf |