US HCR117 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing the sense of Congress that public health professionals should be commended for their dedication and service to the United States on "Public Health Thank You Day", November 21, 2022.
Title
Expressing the sense of Congress that public health professionals should be commended for their dedication and service to the United States on "Public Health Thank You Day", November 21, 2022.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-11-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2022-11-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HCR62 (Related) 2021-11-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-concurrent-resolution/117/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hconres117/BILLS-117hconres117ih.pdf |