US HCR107 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the goals and ideals of National STD Awareness Month. Recognizes the human toll of sexually transmitted infections and the importance of making the prevention, diagnosis, and treatment of such infections an urgent public health priority. Urges all sexually active individuals to get tested for such infections and seek appropriate care.
Title
Supporting the goals and ideals of "National STD Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Rep. Donna Christensen [D-VI] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Carolyn Kilpatrick [D-MI] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
Rep. Laura Richardson [D-CA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Joe Sestak [D-PA] |
Rep. Henry Waxman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-27 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2009-04-23 | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HR1250 (Same As) 2010-04-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR509 (Related) 2010-04-29 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2813)
SR509 (Related) 2010-04-29 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2813)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Sexually transmitted diseases
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Sexually transmitted diseases
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-concurrent-resolution/107/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hconres107/BILLS-111hconres107ih.pdf |