US HB999 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates approximately 30,621 acres of specified Forest Service and Bureau of Land Management land in Oregon as the "Devil's Staircase Wilderness" and as a component of the National Wilderness Preservation System. The bill also designates specified segments of Franklin and Wasson creeks in Oregon as components of the National Wild and Scenic Rivers System.
Title
Devil’s Staircase Wilderness Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Geography and mapping
Lakes and rivers
Oregon
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Lakes and rivers
Oregon
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/999/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr999/BILLS-116hr999ih.pdf |