US HB998 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the percentage that states receive from sales, bonuses, royalties, and rentals for all public land or mineral deposits located in the states by eliminating administrative costs that are deducted from the share allocated to states under current law. The bill eliminates the 2% fee that the federal government currently deducts from a state's share to cover administrative or other costs. On request of a state, the Department of the Interior must convey to the state a property interest in the state's share of royalties and other payments from public land or mineral deposits located in the state. Interior must provide prompt notice of any such conveyance and the duty of the leaseholder to make direct payments to the state.
Title
State Mineral Revenue Protection Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB218 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB4294 (Related) 2019-09-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
HB4294 (Related) 2019-09-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Subjects
Energy
Energy revenues and royalties
Intergovernmental relations
Mining
Oil and gas
State and local finance
Energy revenues and royalties
Intergovernmental relations
Mining
Oil and gas
State and local finance
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/998/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr998/BILLS-116hr998ih.pdf |