US HB4294 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Introduced on September 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

American Energy First Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

American Energy First Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-09-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2019-09-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
2019-09-11HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-09-11HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB998 (Related) 2019-02-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB1014 (Related) 2019-10-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 182.
HB1650 (Related) 2019-03-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB3424 (Related) 2019-07-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
HB4026 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB218 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB499 (Related) 2019-05-14 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
SB2270 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback