US HB996 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 3901 MacArthur Blvd., in New Orleans, Louisiana, as the "Dr. Rudy Lombard Post Office".
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 3901 MacArthur Blvd., in New Orleans, Louisiana, as the "Dr. Rudy Lombard Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. Troy Carter [D-LA] | Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] | Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] |
Rep. Julia Letlow [R-LA] | Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2023-10-02 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-10-02 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4942) |
2023-10-02 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 996. |
2023-10-02 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4942-4943) |
2023-10-02 | House | Mr. Comer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2023-07-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2023-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability. |
2023-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |