US HB984 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the National Trails System Act to direct the Secretary of the Interior to conduct a study on the feasibility of designating the Chief Standing Bear National Historic Trail, and for other purposes. Amends the National Trails System Act to direct the Department of the Interior to conduct a study on feasibility of designating as a national historic trail the Chief Standing Bear Trail, extending approximately 550 miles from Niobrara, Nebraska, to Ponca City, Oklahoma, which follows the route taken by Chief Standing Bear and the Ponca people during federal Indian removal, and approximately 550 miles from Ponca City through Omaha, Nebraska, to Niobrara, Nebraska, which follows the return route taken by Chief Standing Bear and the Ponca people. Requires Interior to consider input from owners of private land within or adjacent to such study area.
Title
To amend the National Trails System Act to direct the Secretary of the Interior to conduct a study on the feasibility of designating the Chief Standing Bear National Historic Trail, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2015-04-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-04-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2487) |
2015-04-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 984. |
2015-04-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2487-2488) |
2015-04-28 | House | Mr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 57. |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-78. |
2015-03-25 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2015-03-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-03-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-03-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2015-02-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB479 (Same As) 2015-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2012 (Related) 2016-09-08 - Conference held.
SB2012 (Related) 2016-09-08 - Conference held.
Subjects
Federal-Indian relations
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Nebraska
Oklahoma
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. history
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Nebraska
Oklahoma
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. history