US HB97 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

RAWR Act Rescuing Animals With Rewards Act of 2019 This bill modifies the Department of State rewards program to authorize rewards to individuals who furnish information that assists in the prevention or identification of crimes related to wildlife trafficking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RAWR Act Rescuing Animals With Rewards Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2019-07-15HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-15HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5802)
2019-07-15HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 97.
2019-07-15HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5802)
2019-07-15HouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-04-09HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-09HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
2019-04-09HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, Energy and the Environment.
2019-01-03HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1590 (Same As) 2019-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback