US SB1590 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-4-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

RAWR Act Rescuing Animals With Rewards Act of 2019 This bill modifies the Department of State rewards program to authorize rewards to individuals who furnish information that assists in the prevention or identification of crimes related to wildlife trafficking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RAWR Act Rescuing Animals With Rewards Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-23HouseHeld at the desk.
2019-10-23HouseReceived in the House.
2019-10-23SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-10-22SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6047; text: CR S6047)
2019-09-26SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 232.
2019-09-26SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment. Without written report.
2019-09-25SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-05-22SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

HB97 (Same As) 2019-07-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback