US HB913 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to require congressional approval before the appropriation of funds for the Department of Veterans Affairs major medical facility leases.
Title
Build a Better VA Act
Sponsors
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3373 (Related) 2022-08-10 - Became Public Law No: 117-168.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/913/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr913/BILLS-117hr913ih.pdf |