US HB8839 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Introduced on September 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Controlled Substances Act to prohibit manufacturing or distributing candy-flavored controlled substances for minors, and for other purposes.
Title
Protecting Kids from Candy-Flavored Drugs Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL] | Rep. Jacob Laturner [R-KS] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] |
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] |
Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Marjorie Greene [R-GA] | Rep. Yvette Herrell [R-NM] |
Rep. Matt Rosendale [R-MT] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX] | Rep. Barry Moore [R-AL] | Rep. Ronny Jackson [R-TX] |
Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Cliff Bentz [R-OR] | Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA] | Rep. Andrew Clyde [R-GA] |
Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] | Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI] |
Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2022-09-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-09-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-09-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8870 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB4628 (Related) 2022-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB4628 (Related) 2022-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/8839/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr8839/BILLS-117hr8839ih.pdf |