US HB879 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of the Interior to remove the Andrew Jackson statue and marble base in Lafayette Square in the District of Columbia, and for other purposes.
Title
Andrew Jackson Statue Removal Act
Sponsors
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Troy Carter [D-LA] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Jill Tokuda [D-HI] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Kevin Mullin [D-CA] |
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-02-08 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E106) |
2023-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB923 (Related) 2023-03-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry.
SB319 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB319 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/879/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr879/BILLS-118hr879ih.pdf |