US HB8731 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-0)
Status: Introduced on August 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend chapter 110 of title 18, United States Code, to prohibit gender affirming care on minors, and for other purposes.
Title
Protect Children’s Innocence Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2022-08-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-08-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1927 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB777 (Related) 2021-03-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB777 (Related) 2021-03-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/8731/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr8731/BILLS-117hr8731ih.pdf |