US HB8647 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to take certain actions to prevent or resolve a default of a housing loan guaranteed by the Secretary, and for other purposes.
Title
VA Home Loan Program Reform Act
Sponsors
Rep. Derrick Van Orden [R-WI] | Rep. Mark Alford [R-MO] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Juan Ciscomani [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-27 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2024-06-27 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-06-12 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2024-06-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2024-06-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2024-06-05 | House | Introduced in House |
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/8647/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr8647/BILLS-118hr8647ih.pdf |