US HB8440 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-29 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-29 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth tax relief provisions for taxpayers residing in a disaster zone. Specifically, the bill allows penalty-free qualified disaster distributions from tax-exempt retirement plans up to $100,000, allows recontributions of distributions for home purchases cancelled due to disasters, increases to $100,000 the limit on loans from retirement plans not treated as distributions, allows an employee retention tax credit for 40% of wages paid by employers affected by a disaster, expands eligibility for disaster-related personal casualty losses, permits the calculation of the earned income tax credit based upon income earned prior to 2020, and suspends the limitation on corporate charitable contributions.
Title
Disaster Tax Relief Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-09-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-09-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4596 (Related) 2020-09-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6762 (Related) 2020-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB8314 (Related) 2020-09-18 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3542 (Related) 2020-03-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4621 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6762 (Related) 2020-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB8314 (Related) 2020-09-18 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3542 (Related) 2020-03-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4621 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Business expenses
Disaster relief and insurance
Employee benefits and pensions
Housing finance and home ownership
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
U.S. territories and protectorates
Wages and earnings
Disaster relief and insurance
Employee benefits and pensions
Housing finance and home ownership
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
U.S. territories and protectorates
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8440/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8440/BILLS-116hr8440ih.pdf |