US HB8325 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends authority through December 31, 2021, for the Department of Agriculture (USDA) to issue waivers of requirements under the National School Lunch Program, the School Breakfast Program, the Child and Adult Care Food Program, and the summer food service program for children due to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). Under current law, such waiver authority expires on September 30, 2020. Additionally, USDA must extend through at least the end of the 2020-2021 school year all of the child nutrition waivers granted under the Families First Coronavirus Response Act that as of September 11, 2020, were set to expire on December 31, 2020.
Title
Operation Feed Our Kids Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] |
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] |
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2020-09-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Agriculture and food
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child health
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Food assistance and relief
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Nutrition and diet
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child health
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Food assistance and relief
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Nutrition and diet
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8325/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8325/BILLS-116hr8325ih.pdf |