US HB824 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the relief of Daniel Wachira.
Title
For the relief of Daniel Wachira.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2012-12-04 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-12-04 | House | On passage Passed without objection. |
2012-12-04 | House | Considered from the Private Calendar. |
2012-07-24 | House | Placed on the Private Calendar, Calendar No. 2. |
2012-07-24 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-618. |
2012-06-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2012-06-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2012-06-26 | House | Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement Discharged. |
2011-02-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement. |
2011-02-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2011-02-18 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E331) |