US HB8199 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the duties of the Office of Credit Risk Management to include oversight of a certified development company (CDC) that participates in the 504 Loan Program of the Small Business Administration (SBA), and it requires the SBA to issue rules related to certain environmental requirements. The 504 Loan Program provides a small business with SBA financing—through a CDC intermediary—for expansion or modernization. Specifically, the bill requires the office to oversee any CDC that participates in the program and to conduct file reviews with respect to loan closings under the program. Further, the bill authorizes the office to take formal and informal enforcement actions against a CDC for specified violations and to charge each CDC a fee. The SBA must issue rules to clarify the procedures necessary for an eligible CDC to comply with certain environmental requirements.
Title
504 Credit Risk Management Improvement Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Bishop [R-NC] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
2020-12-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6076-6077) |
2020-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8199. |
2020-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6076-6078) |
2020-12-03 | House | Ms. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2020-09-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business records
Commerce
Financial services and investments
Small business
Small Business Administration
User charges and fees
Administrative remedies
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business records
Commerce
Financial services and investments
Small business
Small Business Administration
User charges and fees