US HB8121 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires studies and reports about the effects of COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) with respect to tourism and consumer product safety. Specifically, the Consumer Product Safety Commission must report, and make available to the public, information about injuries and deaths from consumer products during the COVID-19 public health emergency. The report must be submitted every three months for the duration of the emergency. Additionally, the Department of Commerce, in consultation with appropriate stakeholders, must study and report about the effects of the pandemic on the travel and tourism industry. Commerce must consider metrics including changes in employment rate, sales, and business revenue, and it must provide the opportunity for public comment. An interim study and report must be submitted not later than three months after the enactment of this bill.
Title
Pandemic Effects on Home Safety and Tourism Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2020-11-17 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5833-5834) |
2020-11-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8121. |
2020-11-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5833-5835) |
2020-11-17 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 486. |
2020-11-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-588. |
2020-09-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-08-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-08-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8122 (Related) 2020-08-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SB4847 (Related) 2020-11-18 - Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
SB4884 (Related) 2020-12-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 642.
SB4847 (Related) 2020-11-18 - Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
SB4884 (Related) 2020-12-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 642.
Subjects
Aging
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child health
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health information and medical records
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Minority health
Product development and innovation
Product safety and quality
Travel and tourism
Unemployment
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child health
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health information and medical records
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Minority health
Product development and innovation
Product safety and quality
Travel and tourism
Unemployment