US HB812 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides statutory authorization for the Operation Stonegarden program from FY2022 through FY2025 and contains other provisions related to border security. (Operation Stonegarden provides grants to enhance the border security capabilities of state, local, and tribal governments.) From FY2022 through FY2025, the money from unreported monetary instruments seized from individuals crossing the U.S.-Mexico border and transferred into the Department of the Treasury general fund shall be made available without further appropriation to the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to fund Operation Stonegarden. DHS shall report to Congress on (1) DHS hiring practices from 2017 to 2020, and (2) whether certain Mexican drug cartels meet the criteria to be designated as foreign terrorist organizations. DHS shall also periodically report to Congress about the technology needed to secure the U.S.-Mexico land border.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Security First Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-23HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2021-04-23HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2021-02-05HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability.
2021-02-05HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
2021-02-04HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-02-04HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-02-04HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H334)
2021-02-04HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB6673 (Related) 2022-02-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback