US HB7966 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on August 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Interior, after receiving a request from La Paz County, Arizona, to convey approximately 4,800 acres of identified land managed by the Bureau of Land Management to the county. Interior shall exclude from the conveyance any federal land that contains significant cultural, environmental, wildlife, or recreational resources. As a condition of the conveyance, La Paz County and any subsequent owner shall make good faith efforts to avoid disturbing tribal artifacts; minimize impacts on tribal artifacts if they are disturbed; coordinate with the Colorado River Indian Tribes Tribal Historic Preservation Office to identify artifacts of cultural and historic significance; and allow tribal representatives to rebury unearthed artifacts at, or near, where they were discovered. The federal land is withdrawn from the operation of U.S. mining and mineral leasing laws.
Title
La Paz County Solar Energy and Job Creation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] |
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2020-09-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2020-09-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2020-08-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2020-08-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4475 (Same As) 2020-09-16 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
HB304 (Similar To) 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
SB54 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB304 (Similar To) 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
SB54 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Arizona
Historical and cultural resources
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
Historical and cultural resources
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7966/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7966/BILLS-116hr7966ih.pdf |