US HB7920 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Agricultural Research, Extension, and Education Reform Act of 1998 to direct the Secretary of Agriculture to establish a program under which the Secretary will award competitive grants to eligible entities for the purpose of establishing and enhancing farming and ranching opportunities for veterans.
Title
AG VETS Act Agriculture Grants for Veterans Education and Training Services Act
Sponsors
Rep. Derrick Van Orden [R-WI] | Rep. Donald Davis [D-NC] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Lori Chavez-DeRemer [R-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-27 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote. |
2024-06-27 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-06-12 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2024-05-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2024-04-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2024-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8467 (Related) 2024-05-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
SB4386 (Related) 2024-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB4386 (Related) 2024-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/7920/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr7920/BILLS-118hr7920ih.pdf |