US HB7682 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-29 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-29 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of State to submit a strategy outlining U.S. support for a transition to civilian-led government in Sudan, and it authorizes certain measures to support and assist such a political transition. Specifically, the bill requires the State Department to submit a strategy that includes (1) an articulation of specific U.S. objectives for the political transition in Sudan and a plan to achieve such objectives; (2) an assessment of reforms necessary to promote human rights, essential freedoms, and accountability, as well as a description of efforts to address such reforms; and (3) an assessment of security sector reforms by the Sudanese government, such as demobilizing militias and fostering civilian control of the armed forces. The bill also authorizes the President to provide certain support for (1) democratic governance, rule of law, human rights, and fundamental freedoms; (2) programs to advance economic growth, private-sector productivity, and market-based solutions to development challenges; (3) conflict mitigation strategies to support long-term peace, stability and oversight of Sudanese security and intelligence services; and (4) accountability for war crimes, crimes against humanity, and genocide. The President must impose sanctions on individuals who the President determines are committing human rights abuses, exploiting natural resources, or undermining the political transition in Sudan. Upon certification that Sudan has taken steps to improve fiscal transparency, the Department of the Treasury and the State Department must engage with international financial institutions to restructure, reschedule, or cancel the sovereign debt of Sudan. During the transitional period in Sudan, Treasury may also support the use of certain funds to respond to the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) outbreak in Sudan.
Title
Sudan Democratic Transition, Accountability, and Fiscal Transparency Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-07-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6094 (Related) 2020-03-05 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Africa
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Civil actions and liability
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic development
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Evidence and witnesses
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign loans and debt
Foreign property
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Judicial procedure and administration
Metals
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military command and structure
Mining
Multilateral development programs
News media and reporting
Oil and gas
Political parties and affiliation
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Rule of law and government transparency
Sanctions
South Sudan
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Sudan
Terrorism
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Women in business
Women's rights
World health
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Civil actions and liability
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic development
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Evidence and witnesses
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign loans and debt
Foreign property
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Judicial procedure and administration
Metals
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military command and structure
Mining
Multilateral development programs
News media and reporting
Oil and gas
Political parties and affiliation
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Rule of law and government transparency
Sanctions
South Sudan
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Sudan
Terrorism
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Women in business
Women's rights
World health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7682/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7682/BILLS-116hr7682ih.pdf |