US HB7653 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to update certain terminology regarding veteran employment.
Title
VERY Act of 2024 Veterans Employment Readiness Yield Act of 2024
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Davis [D-NC] | Rep. Juan Ciscomani [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote. |
2024-04-17 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-20 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2024-03-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/7653/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr7653/BILLS-118hr7653ih.pdf |