US HB7610 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 358.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 358.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides FY2021 appropriations for the Department of Agriculture (USDA), the Food and Drug Administration, and related agencies. The bill provides appropriations to USDA for Agricultural Programs, including the Office of the Secretary, Executive Operations, the Economic Research Service, the National Agricultural Statistics Service, the Agricultural Research Service, the National Institute of Food and Agriculture, the Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, the Agricultural Marketing Service, and the Food Safety and Inspection Service. The bill also provides appropriations to USDA for Farm Production and Conservation Programs, including the Farm Production and Conservation Business Center, the Farm Service Agency, the Risk Management Agency, and the Natural Resources Conservation Service. The bill provides appropriations to the Federal Crop Insurance Corporation Fund and the Commodity Credit Corporation Fund. For USDA Rural Development programs, the bill includes appropriations for Rural Development Salaries and Expenses, the Rural Housing Service, the Rural Business-Cooperative Service, and the Rural Utilities Service. The bill provides appropriations to the Food and Nutrition Service for Child Nutrition Programs; the Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children (WIC); the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP, formerly known as the food stamp program); the Commodity Assistance Program; and Nutrition Programs Administration. The bill provides appropriations to the Foreign Agricultural Service for (1) Food for Peace Title II Grants, and (2) McGovern-Dole International Food for Education and Child Nutrition Program Grants. The bill also provides appropriations for the Food and Drug Administration, the Commodity Futures Trading Commission, and the Farm Credit Administration. Additionally, the bill sets forth requirements and restrictions for using funds provided by this and other appropriations Acts.
Title
Agriculture, Rural Development, Food and Drug Administration, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 358. |
2020-07-13 | House | The House Committee on Appropriations reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-446, by Mr. Bishop (GA). |
Same As/Similar To
HB7608 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
SB4492 (Related) 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB133 (Related) 2020-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-260.
SB4492 (Related) 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB133 (Related) 2020-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-260.
Subjects
Adult day care
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Agricultural education
Agricultural insurance
Agricultural marketing and promotion
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Agricultural research
Agricultural trade
Animal and plant health
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Appropriations
Asia
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child care and development
Child health
China
Commodities markets
Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Congressional oversight
Department of Agriculture
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Economic development
Economics and public finance
Educational technology and distance education
Electric power generation and transmission
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Executive agency funding and structure
Farm Credit Administration
Floods and storm protection
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Food assistance and relief
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Foreign aid and international relief
Government lending and loan guarantees
Historical and cultural resources
Housing and community development funding
Indian lands and resources rights
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Internet and video services
Meat
Mining
Minnesota
Nutrition and diet
Public utilities and utility rates
Rural conditions and development
Solid waste and recycling
Trade restrictions
Water use and supply
Watersheds
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Worker safety and health
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Agricultural education
Agricultural insurance
Agricultural marketing and promotion
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Agricultural research
Agricultural trade
Animal and plant health
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Appropriations
Asia
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child care and development
Child health
China
Commodities markets
Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Congressional oversight
Department of Agriculture
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Economic development
Economics and public finance
Educational technology and distance education
Electric power generation and transmission
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Executive agency funding and structure
Farm Credit Administration
Floods and storm protection
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Food assistance and relief
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Foreign aid and international relief
Government lending and loan guarantees
Historical and cultural resources
Housing and community development funding
Indian lands and resources rights
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Internet and video services
Meat
Mining
Minnesota
Nutrition and diet
Public utilities and utility rates
Rural conditions and development
Solid waste and recycling
Trade restrictions
Water use and supply
Watersheds
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7610/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7610/BILLS-116hr7610rh.pdf |