US HB7609 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 357.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 357.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides FY2021 appropriations for Military Construction, the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA), and related agencies. The bill provides appropriations to the Department of Defense (DOD) for Military Construction for the Army; the Navy and Marine Corps; the Air Force; Defense-wide agencies and activities; the Army and Air National Guard; and the Army, Navy, and Air Force Reserves. The bill also provides appropriations to DOD for the North Atlantic Treaty Organization (NATO) Security Investment Program; the Base Closure Account; Construction and Operation and Maintenance of Family Housing for the Army, the Navy and Marine Corps, the Air Force, and Defense-wide agencies and activities; the Family Housing Improvement Fund; and the Military Unaccompanied Housing Improvement Fund. Within the VA budget, the bill provides appropriations for the Veterans Benefits Administration, the Veterans Health Administration, the National Cemetery Administration, and Departmental Administration. The bill provides appropriations for related agencies and programs, including the American Battle Monuments Commission, the U.S. Court of Appeals for Veterans Claims, Cemeterial Expenses of the Army, and the Armed Forces Retirement Home. The bill provide appropriations to specified DOD military construction accounts for Overseas Contingency Operations. The bill also sets forth requirements and restrictions for using funds provided by this and other appropriations Acts.
Title
Military Construction, Veterans Affairs, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 357. |
2020-07-13 | House | The House Committee on Appropriations reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-445, by Ms. Wasserman Schultz. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3277 (Related) 2019-07-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB7608 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HB133 (Related) 2020-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-260.
HB7608 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HB133 (Related) 2020-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-260.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7609/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7609/BILLS-116hr7609rh.pdf |