US HB757 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands eligibility for restitution that is provided to certain individuals who were exposed to atmospheric nuclear testing and developed specified cancers. Specifically, the bill expands eligibility to include qualified individuals who were exposed in any part of Clark County, Nevada, or Mohave County, Arizona.
Title
Downwinders Compensation Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB776 (Same As) 2019-03-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5992 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB5992 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Subjects
Arizona
Cancer
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Civil actions and liability
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Government liability
Law
Nevada
Nuclear weapons
Radiation
Cancer
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Civil actions and liability
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Government liability
Law
Nevada
Nuclear weapons
Radiation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/757/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr757/BILLS-116hr757ih.pdf |